Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/01/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/07/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/07/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/07/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/07/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/07/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 10/07/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/07/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/26/2009