Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/14/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/17/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/17/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/22/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/22/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/22/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/22/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/22/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/22/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/22/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/24/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/24/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/24/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/24/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/24/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/24/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/25/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/25/2009