Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/10/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/10/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/10/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/10/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/10/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/10/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/10/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/10/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/10/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/10/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/10/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/14/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/14/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/14/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/16/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/22/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/23/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/23/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/23/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/23/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/30/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/08/2009