Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/31/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/09/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/09/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/09/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/16/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/22/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/07/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/08/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/02/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 02/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/24/2010