Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/31/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/31/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/31/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/10/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/10/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/10/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/10/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/17/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/17/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/17/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/01/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/08/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/15/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/01/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/13/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/26/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/26/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/26/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/30/2010