Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/21/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/21/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/21/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/21/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/21/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/21/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/21/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/22/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/22/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/22/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/22/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/22/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/22/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 01/22/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 01/22/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/22/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/22/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/22/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 01/22/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/22/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 01/22/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/22/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 01/22/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/26/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/26/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/27/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/09/2009