Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/28/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/23/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/03/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/12/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/18/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/02/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/16/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/17/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/23/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/23/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/23/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/23/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/26/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/26/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/26/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/26/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/26/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/26/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/26/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/26/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/26/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/26/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/26/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/26/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/26/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/26/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/26/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/26/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/26/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/07/2009