Text: H.Res.67 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Engrossed in House (03/11/2009)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 67 Engrossed in House (EH)]

H. Res. 67

                In the House of Representatives, U. S.,

                                                        March 11, 2009.
Whereas the Mars Exploration Rovers Spirit and Opportunity successfully landed 
        on Mars on January 3, 2004, and January 24, 2004, respectively, on 
        missions to search for evidence indicating that Mars once held 
        conditions hospitable to life;
Whereas NASA's Jet Propulsion Laboratory (JPL), managed by the California 
        Institute of Technology (Caltech), designed and built the Rovers, Spirit 
        and Opportunity;
Whereas Cornell University led the development of advanced scientific 
        instruments carried by the 2 Rovers, and continues to play a leading 
        role in the operation of the 2 Rovers and the processing and analysis of 
        the images and other data sent back to Earth;
Whereas the Rovers relayed over a quarter million images taken from the surface 
        of Mars;
Whereas studies conducted by the Rovers have indicated that early Mars was 
        characterized by impacts, explosive volcanoes, and subsurface water;
Whereas each Rover has discovered geological evidence of ancient Martian 
        environments where habitable conditions may have existed;
Whereas the Rovers have explored over 21 kilometers of Martian terrain, climbed 
        Martian hills, descended deep into large craters, survived dust storms, 
        and endured 3 cold, dark Martian winters; and
Whereas Spirit and Opportunity will have passed 5 years of successful operation 
        on the surface of Mars on January 3, 2009, and January 24, 2009, 
        respectively, far exceeding the original 90-Martian day mission 
        requirement by a factor of 20, and are continuing their missions of 
        surface exploration and scientific discovery: Now therefore be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) commends the engineers, scientists, and technicians of the Jet 
        Propulsion Laboratory and Cornell University for their successful 
        execution and continued operation of the Mars Exploration Rovers, Spirit 
        and Opportunity; and
            (2) recognizes the success and significant scientific contributions 
        of NASA's Mars Exploration Rovers.
            Attest:

                                                                          Clerk.