Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/14/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/13/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 10/20/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/20/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/20/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/21/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/21/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew