Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 07/08/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/10/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/13/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/13/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/15/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/16/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/16/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/16/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/16/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/16/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/16/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/16/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/17/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/17/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/22/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/22/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/24/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/28/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/28/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/28/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/28/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/15/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/25/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/03/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/02/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 12/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/12/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/02/2010