Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 07/07/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/17/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/17/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/17/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/17/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/17/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/17/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/17/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/17/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/17/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/17/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/17/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/17/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/17/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/17/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/22/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/22/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/01/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/27/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/14/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/14/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/14/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/14/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/14/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/14/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/14/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/15/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/19/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/19/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/21/2010