Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/20/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/23/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/15/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/15/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/15/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/15/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/15/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/15/2009