Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/17/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/23/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/06/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 10/06/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/06/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/06/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/06/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 10/08/2009