Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/13/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 01/28/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/28/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/28/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/11/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/11/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/11/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/11/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/11/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 02/11/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/11/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/08/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/16/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/17/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/17/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/17/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/22/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/19/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 11/19/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/19/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 11/19/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/19/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 11/19/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 11/19/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/19/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/19/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/19/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/19/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/19/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/19/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/19/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/19/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/19/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/01/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/01/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/01/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/02/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/03/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/03/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/03/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/03/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/08/2009