Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/04/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/04/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/15/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/15/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/15/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/15/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/15/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/15/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 07/15/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/15/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/27/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/28/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/31/2009