Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/04/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/04/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/04/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/10/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/10/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/10/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/16/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/24/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/24/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/24/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/28/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/13/2009