Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 05/14/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/03/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/03/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/08/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/08/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/16/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/24/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/19/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/26/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/13/2010