Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/09/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/15/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/15/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/15/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/10/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 02/13/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/13/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/26/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/26/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/26/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/06/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/06/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/19/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/19/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/19/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/31/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/31/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/31/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/31/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/31/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/29/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/29/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/14/2009