Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/26/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/26/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/07/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/16/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/01/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/16/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2010