Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/14/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/14/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/14/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/14/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/14/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 05/14/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/14/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/21/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/21/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/21/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/02/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/09/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/18/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/24/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/08/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/10/2009