Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/04/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/04/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/11/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/11/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/12/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/18/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/19/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/19/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/19/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/19/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/21/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/21/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/21/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/23/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/16/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/16/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/22/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/15/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/28/2010