Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 04/27/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/27/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/30/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/04/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/14/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/20/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/20/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/20/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/20/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/03/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/08/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/10/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/11/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/11/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/12/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/12/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/12/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/12/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/12/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/12/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/12/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/12/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/12/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/12/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/12/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/12/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/12/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/12/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/12/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/12/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/12/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/12/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/12/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/12/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/16/2009