Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/30/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/01/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/01/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/02/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/22/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/22/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/22/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/22/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/23/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/23/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/23/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/23/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/23/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/23/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/28/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/05/2009