Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/17/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/17/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/23/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/25/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/25/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/25/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/25/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/25/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/25/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/25/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/25/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/25/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/30/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/30/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/21/2009