Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/08/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/08/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/08/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/09/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/23/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/26/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/26/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/03/2009