Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 11/18/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/18/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 11/18/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 11/18/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 11/18/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 11/18/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/30/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/30/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/30/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/30/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/30/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 11/30/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 12/01/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/01/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 12/01/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/01/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 12/01/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/01/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/01/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/01/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/01/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/02/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/02/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/07/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 12/07/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/07/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/07/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/07/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 12/07/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/07/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/07/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 12/09/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/15/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/17/2010