Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/22/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 09/22/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/28/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/28/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/16/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/16/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/16/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 11/16/2010