Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/29/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/15/2010