Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/14/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/14/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/16/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/16/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/16/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/16/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/16/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/23/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/28/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/28/2010