Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/15/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/15/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/22/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/28/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/28/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/28/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/28/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/28/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/28/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/28/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/15/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/15/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/15/2010