Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/28/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/28/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/16/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/30/2010