Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 07/29/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/16/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/16/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/16/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/20/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/20/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/20/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/23/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/17/2010