Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/21/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/21/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/30/2010