Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/19/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/14/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/18/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/18/2010