Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/15/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/20/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/21/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/21/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/21/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/22/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/22/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/22/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/27/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/30/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 08/10/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 08/10/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/16/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/16/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/16/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/16/2010