Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/19/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/19/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/20/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/20/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/21/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/21/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/21/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/21/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/21/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/22/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/22/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/26/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/26/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/27/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/27/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/28/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/29/2010