Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 07/21/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/21/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/21/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/21/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/21/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/21/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/21/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/21/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/21/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/21/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/21/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/27/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/27/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/27/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/27/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/28/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/28/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/28/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/28/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/28/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/28/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/28/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/30/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/30/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/30/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/30/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/30/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/14/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2010