Text: H.Res.1518 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

There is one version of the bill.

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/14/2010)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 111th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 1518 Introduced in House (IH)]

111th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 1518

 Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives on the inaugural 
                   Nelson Mandela International Day.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             July 14, 2010

    Mr. Lewis of Georgia (for himself and Mr. Payne) submitted the 
 following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign 
                                Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives on the inaugural 
                   Nelson Mandela International Day.

Whereas Nelson Rolihlahla Mandela was born to the Thembo Dynasty in Mvezo in the 
        Umtata District of Transkei, South Africa, on July 18, 1918;
Whereas, as a young man, Nelson Mandela became an activist through acts of 
        boycotts, strikes, civil disobedience, and other forms of noncooperation 
        during the fight against apartheid, a system of racial segregation in 
        South Africa;
Whereas, as a leader of the African National Congress (ANC) and the African 
        National Congress Youth League (ANCYL), Nelson Mandela and 9 of his 
        fellow ANC leaders were arrested, charged, and tried for plotting the 
        violent overthrow of the Government of South Africa;
Whereas, on June 12, 1964, 8 of the accused, including Nelson Mandela, were 
        sentenced to life imprisonment;
Whereas, from 1964 to 1982, Nelson Mandela was incarcerated at Robben Island 
        Prison, off the coast of Cape Town, South Africa, before being moved to 
        the maximum-security Pollsmoor Prison in the Cape Town suburb of Tokai;
Whereas, during the years of his imprisonment, Nelson Mandela became widely 
        accepted as the most significant Black leader in South Africa and a 
        symbol of resistance against apartheid, discrimination, and injustice;
Whereas a global movement to release Nelson Mandela and end the South African 
        system of apartheid included international economic sanctions like 
        Public Law No. 99-440, the Anti-Apartheid Act of 1986, and the 
        condemnation of apartheid by countless leaders, artists, intellectuals, 
        and activists;
Whereas at 4:14 p.m. on February 11, 1990, Mandela was released from the Victor 
        Verster prison in Paarl after being a political prisoner for 27 years, 6 
        months, and 1 week;
Whereas the release of Nelson Mandela was a defining moment in the global effort 
        to end apartheid;
Whereas, in 1993, Nelson Mandela and South African President F.W. de Klerk 
        accepted the Nobel Peace Prize and pledged to continue working towards a 
        democratic, nonracial South Africa;
Whereas a series of negotiations between the Government of South Africa and the 
        ANC resulted in the abolishment of apartheid and an election in which 
        almost 20,000,000 South Africans of all ethnicities cast their vote 
        under a national policy of universal suffrage;
Whereas Nelson Mandela was inaugurated as President of the Republic of South 
        Africa on May 10, 1994, and pledged to lead a ``united, democratic, non-
        racial and non-sexist government'' for all people of South Africa;
Whereas, during President Mandela's tenure, there were distinct advancements in 
        racial relations as South Africa transitioned from apartheid and 
        minority rule to a country that aspired to achieve reconciliation, 
        equality, and peace;
Whereas, through President Mandela's leadership, the spirit of ubuntu, the 
        African philosophy of the interconnectedness, caring, sharing, and 
        harmony of humanity, has spread throughout the world;
Whereas, in 1999, President Mandela retired to private life in his town of 
        birth, Qunu, Transkei;
Whereas the United Nations delegates from the countries of Spain and Turkey 
        jointly introduced a resolution to designate July 18 as Nelson Mandela 
        International Day;
Whereas the United States was a proud sponsor of the resolution;
Whereas when speaking in support of the United Nations resolution, Ms. Laura 
        Ross, United States delegate to the United Nations stated that ``Mandela 
        used his moral power for a moral purpose. He turned enemies into 
        partners, fear into trust, hatred into forgiveness, and discrimination 
        into democracy.''; and
Whereas the United Nations General Assembly unanimously adopted A/Res/64/13 to 
        designate July 18 as Nelson Mandela International Day, beginning in 
        2010: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the House of Representatives--
            (1) applauds the United Nations General Assembly for 
        uniting to honor President Mandela's selfless contribution to 
        international peace and freedom;
            (2) recognizes the global impact of President Mandela's 
        legacy and commitment to nonviolence, respect, and dialogue;
            (3) expresses support for the international community's 
        recognition of the inaugural United Nations Nelson Mandela 
        International Day; and
            (4) urges all citizens of the United States to reflect on 
        the importance of peace, tolerance, democracy, human rights, 
        and reconciliation in honor of Nelson Mandela International 
        Day.
                                 <all>