Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/14/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/15/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/20/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/20/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/20/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/21/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/22/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/22/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/26/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/28/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/29/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/30/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/10/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 08/10/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/29/2010