Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/01/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/22/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/29/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/07/2010