Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/01/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/14/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/14/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/14/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/14/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/14/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/14/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/14/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/14/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/14/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/19/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/19/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/19/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/19/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/19/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/19/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/19/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/21/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/21/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/21/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/26/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/26/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/26/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/26/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2010