Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/01/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/13/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 08/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/15/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/15/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/15/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/22/2010