Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/14/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/14/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/19/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/30/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 08/10/2010