Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/29/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/29/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/13/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/21/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/21/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/21/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/21/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/21/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/21/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/21/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/30/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/20/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/20/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/20/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/20/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/15/2010