Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/01/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/01/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/01/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/20/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/20/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/20/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/20/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/20/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/22/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/22/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/26/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/26/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/26/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/26/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/26/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/26/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/28/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/30/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/30/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/14/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/14/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/16/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/16/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/16/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/16/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/16/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/28/2010