Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/29/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/29/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/29/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/29/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/29/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/29/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/29/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/29/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/29/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/29/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/29/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/29/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/29/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/29/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/30/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 06/30/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/30/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/30/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/30/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/30/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/30/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/30/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/30/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/30/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/30/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/30/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/30/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/30/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/30/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/30/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/30/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/30/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/30/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/01/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/01/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/01/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/14/2010