Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 06/25/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/25/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/25/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/01/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/26/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/26/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/27/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/27/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 07/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/27/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/27/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/27/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/27/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/27/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/27/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 08/10/2010