Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/24/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/24/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/24/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/01/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/01/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/01/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/01/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/01/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/14/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/14/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/14/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/14/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/19/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/20/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/29/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/29/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/15/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/22/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/28/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/16/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/16/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/16/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/16/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/16/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/16/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/16/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/16/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/16/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/16/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/16/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/16/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/16/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/16/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/16/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/16/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/16/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/16/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/17/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/17/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/17/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/18/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/29/2010