Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/29/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/29/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/19/2010