Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/16/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/19/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/19/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/19/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/19/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/19/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/19/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/19/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/19/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/19/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/27/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/28/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/28/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/29/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/15/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/23/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/23/2010